This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 03:27:26 (UTC).

AARON CASTRO vs. SBM, et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2016 AARON CASTRO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SBM. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Karesh, Jonathan E, Miram, George A, Miram, George A. and Karesh, Jonathan E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0083

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Karesh, Jonathan E

Miram, George A

Miram, George A.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTRO, AARON

Defendants

DOES 1- 10

SBM

KAHN, ELI

SBM SITE SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLUSMAN, PAUL

PECK, ELIZABETH M.

Defendant Attorney

GEANNACOPULOS, NICK C

 

Court Documents

Remittitur.

Remittitur Appeal A150032 reversed; remanded for arbitration Comment Appeal A150032 reversed; remanded for arbitration

Opinion received.

Opinion received A150032 - reversed; remanded for arbitration Comment A150032 - reversed; remanded for arbitration

Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal.

Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal First Appellate District - A150032 Comment First Appellate District - A150032

Supplemental.

Supplemental BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION Comment BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Declaration.

Declaration OF JANICE PERIOLAT IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRA Comment OF JANICE PERIOLAT IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY

Reply.

Reply IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY Comment IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received RE: ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ETC Comment RE: ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC

Declaration.

Declaration OF ALISON LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION ETC. Comment OF ALISON LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION, ETC.

Respondent's brief received.

Respondent's brief received A150032 Comment A150032

Motion / Petition to Compel Arbitration.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GLUSMAN, PAUL

Declaration.

Declaration OF ALISON LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ETC Comment OF ALISON LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, ETC

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO ST Comment IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION

Motion.

Motion TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION Comment TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Stipulation.

Stipulation JOINT TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Comment JOINT TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT.

Stipulation.

Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Comment TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT RON ALVARADO, AUTHORIZED TO ACCPET Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT RON ALVARADO, AUTHORIZED TO ACCPET

Complaint.

Complaint

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Karesh Jonathan E.; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: KAHN, ELI; Comment: PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 090216.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Further Proceedings. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Further Proceedings 07/05/2018 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 09:30 AM Result Held Comment Matter to Proceed to Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Remittitur. Additional Info: Remittitur Appeal A150032 reversed; remanded for arbitration Comment Appeal A150032 reversed; remanded for arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opinion received. Additional Info: Opinion received A150032 - reversed; remanded for arbitration Comment A150032 - reversed; remanded for arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Respondent's brief received. Additional Info: Respondent's brief received A150032 Comment A150032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's opening brief received. Additional Info: Appellant's opening brief received on appeal A150032 with appendix Comment on appeal A150032, with appendix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: PECK PETERSON LLP New Attorney: ELIZABETH PECK Comment Former Attorney: PECK PETERSON, LLP New Attorney: ELIZABETH PECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal. Additional Info: Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal First Appellate District - A150032 Comment First Appellate District - A150032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate - 8.124 - Register of Actions. Additional Info: Clerk's Certificate - 8.124 - Register of Actions on appeal A150032 Comment on appeal A150032

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial info for SBM SITE SERVICES, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-029087-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial info for SBM SITE SERVICES, LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial: SBM SITE SERVICES, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $795.00; Total Payments and Credits $795.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for CASTRO, AARON : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-063332-HOJ RAPID LEGAL $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for CASTRO, AARON : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Financial info for CASTRO, AARON : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-033634-HOJ CASTRO, AARON $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Financial info for CASTRO, AARON : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Financial info for CASTRO, AARON : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-023292-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Financial info for CASTRO, AARON : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Financial: CASTRO, AARON; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less