This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:55 (UTC).

JEROME SERI vs. DINA GRIGOROVITCH

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 JEROME SERI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DINA GRIGOROVITCH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reyna, Renee C., Duesdieker, George and Mazzei, Cristina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0731

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Reyna, Renee C.

Duesdieker, George

Mazzei, Cristina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A1 CLEANING SYSTEMS JEROME SERI

SERI, JEROME

Defendant

GRIGOROVITCH, DINA

 

Court Documents

Motion to Vacate - Small Claims.

Motion to Vacate - Small Claims

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: Dina Grigorovitch Comment Judgment Debtor: Dina Grigorovitch

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 65.00Hearing Date: 07/20/2018 Comment Costs: 65.00 Hearing Date: 07/20/2018

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/20/2018 Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

Bench Warrant Issued.

Bench Warrant Issued DINA GRIGORVITCH Comment DINA GRIGORVITCH

Decision by Court Mailed to Parties.

Decision by Court Mailed to Parties

Motion - Vacate Small Claims Judgment.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion - Vacate Small Claims Judgment 08/22/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: GRIGOROVITCH, DINA

Proof of Service of OEX.

Proof of Service of OEX Served by: registered Process Server Costs: 100.00 Comment Served by: registered Process Server Costs: 100.00

Small Claims Request for Continuance Denied.

Small Claims Request for Continuance Denied

Small Claims Request for Continuance.

Small Claims Request for Continuance

Small Claims Law and Motion.

Original Type Order of Examination ~CIV Minute Order - 04/03/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Law and Motion 04/03/2019 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 09/26/2018 Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment Court Trial Parties Present Plaintiff: A1 CLEANING SYSTEMS JEROME SERIDefendant: GRIGOROVITCH, DINA

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Small Claims Law and Motion.

Original Type Order of Examination ~CIV Minute Order - 04/03/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Law and Motion 04/03/2019 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Duesdieker George; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: SERI, JEROME; Awarded Against: GRIGOROVITCH, DINA; Amount; Damages: $900.00; Costs: $95.00; Total: $995.00; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR PLAINTIFF JEROME SERI ONLY AND AGAINST DEFENDANT; Party; Names: SERI, JEROME; GRIGOROVITCH, DINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Duesdieker George; Judgment Type; Set Aside Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: SERI, JEROME; Awarded Against: GRIGOROVITCH, DINA; Amount; Damages: $1,200.00; Costs: $95.00; Total: $1295.00; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT.; Party; Names: SERI, JEROME; GRIGOROVITCH, DINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Warrant issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Bench Warrant Issued. Additional Info: Bench Warrant Issued DINA GRIGORVITCH Comment DINA GRIGORVITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Law and Motion. Additional Info: Original Type Order of Examination ~CIV Minute Order - 04/03/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Law and Motion 04/03/2019 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of OEX. Additional Info: Proof of Service of OEX Served by: registered Process Server Costs: 100.00 Comment Served by: registered Process Server Costs: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination. Additional Info: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: Dina Grigorovitch Comment Judgment Debtor: Dina Grigorovitch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • No Longer Under Submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • Financial info for GRIGOROVITCH, DINA : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-053200-HOJ GRIGOROVITCH, DINA $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Financial info for GRIGOROVITCH, DINA : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Financial info for GRIGOROVITCH, DINA : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-047477-HOJ GRIGOROVITCH, DINA $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Financial info for GRIGOROVITCH, DINA : Transaction Assessment $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Financial: GRIGOROVITCH, DINA; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Financial info for SERI, JEROME : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-007613-HOJ SERI, JEROME $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Financial info for SERI, JEROME : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for SERI, JEROME : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037416-HOJ A1 CLEANING SYSTEMS JEROME SERI $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for SERI, JEROME : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: SERI, JEROME; Total Financial Assessment $90.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less