This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:41:49 (UTC).

1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. vs. WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 1740 OAK AVENUE, L P filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2813

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P.

ROES 20-50, INCLUSIVE

WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA INDEPENDENT POLITICAL CORPORATION

DEWOLF NEWMAN FAMILY TRUST

ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC., a California Corporation

ARNOLD, MARLENE C.

LANE, SARAH J.

DE WOLF, MICHELLE RENE

ARNOLD, JOHN S.

NEWMAN, THOMAS

MUNOZ, AMANDA A

CARLISLE, ANDREA P.

CARLISLE, JEFFREY G.

WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT

SPURLOCK, LUCILE B.

WHITE, CHRISTOPHER WARD

HEININGER, DIANE ELIZABETH

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

NEWMAN, MICHAEL THOMAS

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARTINEZ, CARLOS

FOX, JILL E

RIDLEY, SHAWN M., ESQ

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

RIDLEY, SHAWN M., ESQ

GULLEN, RICHARD B

SMITH, STANLEY W.

HUNTER, ALAN F.

COMINOS, DION N.

BLAISDELL, BENJAMIN W

PINELLI, ANTHONY F

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GULLEN, RICHARD B

HUNTER, ALAN F.

COMINOS, DION N.

BLAISDELL, BENJAMIN W

PINELLI, ANTHONY F

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 6/14 Comment CMC 6/14

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on ART Comment AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on ART BARS

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on LUCILE Comment AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on LUCILE B. SPURLOCK

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on MARLENE Comment AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on MARLENE C. ARNOLD

Notice.

Notice OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GCA LAW PARTNERS/E. DAVID MARKS New Attorney: JILL E Comment Former Attorney: GCA LAW PARTNERS/E. DAVID MARKS New Attorney: JILL E. FOX ESQ

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT served on TODD H. MASTER/SHAWN M. RIDLEY Comment CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT served on TODD H. MASTER/SHAWN M. RIDLEY

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice.

Notice Notice of Further CMC Comment Notice of Further CMC

Demand For Jury Trial.

Demand for Jury Trial

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of AMENDED SUMMONS; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CMC serv Comment AMENDED SUMMONS; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CMC served on R. PETER LILJEGREN

Notice.

Notice of ERRATA RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment of ERRATA RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on MICHELL Comment AMENDED SUMMONS; AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC... served on MICHELLE RENE DE WOLF

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/21/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer. Additional Info: Answer 1740 Oak Avenue L.P.'s Verified Answer to Cross-Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief Comment 1740 Oak Avenue, L.P.'s Verified Answer to Cross-Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer. Additional Info: Answer Answer of Cross-Defendant West Bay Sanitary District to Cross-Complaint of Michael Thomas New Comment Answer of Cross-Defendant West Bay Sanitary District to Cross-Complaint of Michael Thomas Newman et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer. Additional Info: Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) General Denial TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment General Denial TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Errata. Additional Info: Notice of Errata Notice of Errata Re Verification of Answer to Amended Complaint Comment Notice of Errata Re Verification of Answer to Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice of Errata REGARDING VERIFICATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment OF ERRATA REGARDING VERIFICATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice Notice of Further CMC Comment Notice of Further CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/14/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable. Additional Info: Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • Financial info for WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Financial info for WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Financial: WEST BAY SANITARY DISTRICT, a California SPECIAL DISTRICT; Total Financial Assessment $1,020.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Financial info for 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-045346-HOJ 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Financial info for 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Financial info for 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-066002-HOJ RAPID LEGAL $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Financial info for 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037472-HOJ WITNESS FEE ADVANCE ACCOUNT $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: 1740 OAK AVENUE, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment $1,020.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,020.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gullen, Richard Bruce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COMINOS, DION N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINELLI, ANTHONY F.