This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 11:18:12 (UTC).

Zurich American Insurance Co, vs. Solar Coating, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2015 Zurich American Insurance Co filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Solar Coating, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1598

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zurich American Insurance Co,

Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of The Wine Group

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Solar Coating, Inc.

Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc.

Roes 1-50

Roes 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schroeder, Eric M.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Rambarran, Ian A.

Gray, Wilma J.

Stevens, Amanda R

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 04/25/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Payment Receipt

04/06/2015: Payment Receipt

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Roes 1-50, Solar Coating, Inc. Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Solar Coating, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: CONVERSION.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Solar Coating, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: CONVERSION.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of The Wine Group. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of The Wine Group. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Solar Coating, Inc.; Solar Coating, Inc.; Solar Coating, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Solar Coating, Inc.; Solar Coating, Inc.; Solar Coating, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Roes 1-50, Solar Coating, Inc. Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Solar Coating, Inc.; Solar Coating, Inc.; Solar Coating, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Zurich American Insurance Company Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of The Wine Group. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc.; Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc., Solar Coating, Inc., Roes 1-25 Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2015
  • Automatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Case title updated to Zurich American Insurance Co, vs. Solar Coating, Inc. effective 02/24/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • San Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 07/29/2015 at 08:45:00 AM in 41 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holly, Carter. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as subrogee of The Wine Group on 02/10/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Original Summons filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as subrogee of The Wine Group on 02/10/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Complaint filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as subrogee of The Wine Group on 02/10/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRAND ENERGY & INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROEDER ERIC MARSHALL