This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 16:40:09 (UTC).

Zuckerman Heritage, Inc. vs. California Curb & Landscape Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2010 Zuckerman Heritage, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against California Curb Landscape Company, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************6196

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zuckerman Heritage, Inc.

Defendants

California Curb & Landscape Company, Inc.

Baker, Brad Scott

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

09/24/2010: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Payment Receipt

09/24/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

09/24/2010: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

11/03/2010: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Minute Order

12/14/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/16/2010: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

01/12/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

01/12/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

01/12/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

01/12/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

01/12/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

01/20/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Offsite,Records Management to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Offsite,Records Management to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • DocketExhibits destroyed Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Lundeberg, Erik to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • DocketOrder for Payment of Judgment in Installments (Granted) filed by The Superior Court of San Joaquin on 01/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Request for Installment Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Request for Installment Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Lundeberg, Erik Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/24/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketFull payment was recorded on 09/24/2010 for . Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 04 - Claim >$1,500<=$5,000, 07 - Certified mail - service by clerk in the amount of 60.00 on 09/24/2010, transaction number and receipt number 151233. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketAddress for Brad Baker selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt filed by Zuckerman Heritage, Inc. on 09/24/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - 5000.00 principal, plus 70.00 costs scheduled for 11/03/2010 at 09:30:00 AM in B1 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department B1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt filed by Zuckerman Heritage, Inc. on 09/24/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Zuckerman Heritage, Inc. on 09/24/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zuckerman-Heritage, Inc. a California corporation is a litigant