This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 12:02:32 (UTC).

ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC vs Ranokx Logistics Inc, a corporation

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ranokx Logistics Inc, a corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1906

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC

Defendant

Ranokx Logistics Inc, a corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba, Rudy Jr.

 

Court Documents

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ranokx Logistics Inc, a corporation served on 03/10/2023 by Substituted Service. $109.00.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. in Support of Clerk's Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.

Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment

Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Summary in Support of Default Judgment filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. in Support of Clerk's Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ranokx Logistics Inc, a corporation served on 03/10/2023 by Substituted Service. $109.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $370.00, receipt number 814980.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketAssessed $370.00 Civil Costs on Plaintiff, ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketPayment received by ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 814759.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Rudy Jr. Gaba, retained for ZMAC Transportation Solutions LLC .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less