This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/23/2018 at 20:20:10 (UTC).

Zeleaem Bekhe vs. Pulte Home Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/05/2014 Zeleaem Bekhe filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7781

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abellar, Crittina

Ahmad, Ashan

Ahmad, Jasmine

Bekhe, Zeleaem

Cobain, Beatriz

Cobain, Gilbrt

Furtado, Lellani

Gagelonia, Nino

Gonzalez, Fenrando

Gradney, Sandy

Gutierrez, Gabriela

Hudson, Kamika

Kaur, Lakhwinder

Kiernan, Tina

Murti, Ruben

Ngug, Mary

Njenga, Daniel

Perez, Oscar

Prasher, Balwinder

Prasher, Nileshini

65 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Whitaker, Michael

Whitaker, Michael Thomas

Other Attorneys

Martha, Richard Hays

Moak, Stacy M.

Marchiano, David M

Tollefson, Suzanne Antoinette

Aguilera, Eric A.

Constantino, Matthew S.

Panchal, Jitesh G.

Burek, Lawrence M.

Welch, Stephen B.

Doran, James W.

 

Court Documents

Order Determining Good Faith Settlement

Order Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement entered as to Milgard Manufacturing, Inc..and Pulte Home Corpor, plaintiffs. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order Staying the SB800 Process in Order to Allow this Case to Proceed to Mediation filed by Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2015 08:30 AM. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint in Intervention as to Villara Corporation served on 04/15/2016 by Substituted Service. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement Regarding Cross-Defendant Barbosa Cabinets, Inc. filed by Barbosa Cabinets, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Settlement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Davis & Davis, Inc. Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

Payment Receipt

10/14/2015: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

01/20/2015: Payment Receipt

212 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • Attorney, James A. Porter, retained for Milgard Manufacturing, Inc. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Temporary Change of Handling Attorney filed by Milgard Manufacturing, Inc.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Attorney, James A. Porter, retained for Sacramento Insulation Contractors . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Attorney, Stephen B. Welch, retained for Merillat Corporation . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Temporary Change of handling Attorney filed by Merillat Corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Temporary Change of Handling Attorney filed by Sacramento Insulation Contractors. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Attorney, James W. Doran, retained for Norman Masonry . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Attorney, James W. Doran, retained for BC Electric . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Attorney, James W. Doran, retained for Creative Design Interiors, Inc. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Handling Attorney filed by Creative Design Interiors, Inc.; Norman Masonry; BC Electric. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
792 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2014
  • Cause of Action number 5 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Cause of Action number 4 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Cause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 01/02/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Ross, Roger. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Original Summons filed by Bekhe, Zeleaem on 08/05/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bekhe, Zeleaem on 08/05/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Complaint filed by Bekhe, Zeleaem on 08/05/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGUILERA ERIC A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANCHAL, JITESH G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tollefson, Suzanne Antoinette

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James W Doran