This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/17/2018 at 00:40:09 (UTC).

Zaneb Ahmed vs. Paq, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2009 Zaneb Ahmed filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Paq, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0300

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahmed, Zaneb

Defendant

Paq, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goehring, Gregory P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/12/2009: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

11/12/2009: Payment Receipt

Order to Show Cause San Joaquin

02/04/2010: Order to Show Cause San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

02/23/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

02/23/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

02/23/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

03/23/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

03/24/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

04/20/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

04/22/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

05/18/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

05/18/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

05/18/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

07/20/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

07/20/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

07/22/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Status of Paq, Inc. updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Status of Zaneb Ahmed updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Complaint associated on 08/09/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Association created between Goehring, Gregory P. and Ahmed, Zaneb. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2009
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 04/20/2010 at 09:00:00 AM in L2 at Lodi Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Ahmed, Zaneb on 11/12/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ahmed, Zaneb on 11/12/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Complaint filed by Ahmed, Zaneb on 11/12/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paq, Inc. dba Food 4 Less and/or Rancho San Miguel Markets, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Goehring, Gregory P