This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 12:01:43 (UTC).

Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee vs Michael J Campoy

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Michael J Campoy. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0559

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee

Defendant

Campoy, Michael J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chan, Phillip

Defendant Attorney

Khan, Saveel

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually ans as Co-Trustee.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually ans as Co-Trustee.

Summons

01/24/2023: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Notice to Filing Party

01/26/2023: Notice to Filing Party

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

01/26/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael J Campoy served on 02/15/2023 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. . First Amended Complaint

Answer

Defendant Michael J. Campoy's Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Campoy, Michael J.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order Vacating Case Management Conference and Setting for Trial filed

Order

Order Vacating Case Management Conference and Setting for Trial filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Michael J Campoy (Defendant); Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Michael J Campoy (Defendant); Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Vacating Case Management Conference and Setting for Trial filed; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 11/12/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Saveel Khan, retained for Michael J Campoy .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Michael J. Campoy's Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Campoy, Michael J.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Michael Campoy in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 832010.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Michael J Campoy served on 02/15/2023 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. . First Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually and as Co-Trustee.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/24/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually ans as Co-Trustee.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually ans as Co-Trustee.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketPayment received by as Yvonne Kreck in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 806206.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Phillip Chan, retained for Yvonne Kreck, as attorney-in-fact for Diane L. Majors, individually ans as Co-Trustee .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less