This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:06:58 (UTC).

Yolanda Dixon vs The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 Yolanda Dixon filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1465

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dixon, Yolanada

Dixon, Yolanda

Defendant

The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alam, Jesmin L

Alam, Jesmin

Defendant Attorney

Hawkins, Matthew K

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/12/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dixon, Yolanda. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. served on 10/18/2016 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dixon, Yolanada. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dixon, Yolanada. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/13/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/15/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/02/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/26/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/08/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference Re: Dismissal, set for 09/20/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on June 21, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/21/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/13/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 13, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/13/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/08/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/26/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/08/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 30994. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dixon, Yolanada. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dixon, Yolanada. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Attorney, Jesmin L Alam, retained for Yolanada Dixon . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less