This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 18:36:47 (UTC).

Workforce Defense League vs Clayco, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 Workforce Defense League filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Clayco, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0716

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Workforce Defense League

Defendants

Clayco, Inc.

United Contractor Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gauger, Matthew J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Notice to Filing Party

01/31/2022: Notice to Filing Party

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Workforce Defense League.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Workforce Defense League.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to United Contractor Services LLC served on 02/22/2022 by Personal Service. $35.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Clayco, Inc. served on 02/22/2022 by Personal Service. $25.00.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Clayco, Inc.; United Contractor Services LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Vacated; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Clayco, Inc. (Defendant); United Contractor Services LLC (Defendant); Workforce Defense League (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Removed to Federal Court.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Clayco, Inc.; United Contractor Services LLC.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Clayco, Inc. served on 02/22/2022 by Personal Service. $25.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to United Contractor Services LLC served on 02/22/2022 by Personal Service. $35.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/29/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Workforce Defense League.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Workforce Defense League.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Workforce Defense League in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 713566.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Matthew J Gauger, retained for Workforce Defense League .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less