This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/13/2019 at 13:38:12 (UTC).

William Paul et al. vs City of Ripon et al.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 William Paul filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Ripon. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3867

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul, William

Defendants

Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California corporation

De Graff Development, Inc

Cross Plaintiffs

City of Ripon

Degraff Development, Inc.

Hensley's Paving and General Engineering,Inc.,a California Corporation

Cross Defendant

VC1 Concrete Construction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sodhi, Jakrun S.

Defendant Attorney

Beeman, Christopher J

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Swingle, Bradley J

Ching, Catharine Ann

Magarrell, Michelle D

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California corporation. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/31/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Cross-Complaint

City of Ripon's Cross-Complaint for Comparative Equitable Indemnity, Contribution and Declaratory Relief Against Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc.filed by City Of Ripon. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California Corporation's Answer to City of Ripon's Cross-Complaint filed by Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California Corporation. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Paul, William. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by De Graff Development, Inc. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to City of Ripon. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons & Complaint filed by Paul, William. (possible duplicate) Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California Corporation. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by City Of Ripon. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 07/27/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 07/13/2020 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on May 31, 2019. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 05/31/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to City of Ripon. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Paul, William. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by City of Ripon. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by De Graff Development, Inc. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Hensley's Paving and General Engineering, Inc., a California corporation served on 04/09/2018 by Personal Service. $76.50. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to City of Ripon served on 04/09/2018 by Personal Service. $69.75. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/01/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Jakrun S. Sodhi, retained for William Paul . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Paul, William. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Paul, William. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketPayment received by William Paul in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 279971. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less