This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 05:06:06 (UTC).

William P Marshall Jr. vs Stacey N Carter

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 William P Marshall Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Stacey N Carter. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6529

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marshall, William P Jr.

Respondent

Carter, Stacey N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thiessen, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of FL-120 and FL-105 as to William P Marshall Jr. served on 01/17/2023 by Personal Service. .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jursidiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) GC-120 filed by Carter, Stacey N.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Stacey N Carter.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Carter, Stacey N.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Stacey N Carter filed. Served on 01/03/2023. Method of Service: Personal Service; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Lisa Thiessen, retained for William P Marshall Jr. .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Marshall, William P Jr..; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received by William Marshall in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 797496.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less