Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 19:43:46 (UTC).

William D. Johns vs Global Material Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 William D Johns filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Global Material Management, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9449

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johns, William D.

Defendant

Global Material Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bojack, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession returned Unserved as to Global Material Management, LLC. Costs $125.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for William D. Johns against Global Material Management, LLC filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

10/28/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Global Material Management, LLC Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Global Material Management, LLC served on 09/22/2016 by Personal Service. $130.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession returned Unserved as to Global Material Management, LLC. Costs $125.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Global Material Management, LLC on 11/02/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Payment received by William Johns in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 116828. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for William D. Johns against Global Material Management, LLC filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Global Material Management, LLC Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Global Material Management, LLC served on 09/22/2016 by Personal Service. $130.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Attorney, Douglas J. Bojack, retained for William D. Johns . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Payment received by William Johns in the amount of $385.00. Receipt number 103052. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Johns, William D.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less