This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:51:17 (UTC).

White & Whitley Group, LLC vs Kimberly Irons

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 White Whitley Group, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kimberly Irons. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1960

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White & Whitley Group, LLC

Defendant

Irons, Kimberly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenosian, John P

 

Court Documents

Declaration

Declaration in Support of judgment CCP 1788.50 filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Kimberly Irons Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kimberly Irons served on 05/02/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $60.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for White & Whitley Group, LLC against Kimberly Irons in the amount of 7480.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of ownership and chain of title from cashcall to white & Whitley group, LLC filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court

Original Creditor's Declaration in Support of entry of default Judgment filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2018
  • Payment received by LLC White & Whitley Group in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 253726. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Kimberly Irons on 01/19/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Payment received by LLC White & Whitley Group in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 248895. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for White & Whitley Group, LLC against Kimberly Irons in the amount of 7480.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Kimberly Irons Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of ownership and chain of title from cashcall to white & Whitley group, LLC filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Kimberly Irons served on 05/02/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $60.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by White & Whitley Group, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, John P Kenosian, retained for White & Whitley Group, LLC . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 35038. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less