This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:07 (UTC).

Wheels Financial Group, Llc vs Maria Munoz

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Wheels Financial Group, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maria Munoz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1897

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wheels Financial Group, Llc

Defendant

Munoz, Maria

 

Court Documents

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Wheels Financial Group, Llc. Roberto Montejano. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service as to Maria Munoz (Personal). costs 85.50 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court and Fictitious Business Name

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Wheels Financial Group, Llc. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear filed by Wheels Financial Group, Llc. Roberto Montejano. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 28, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Maria Munoz (Personal). costs 85.50 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/28/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. principal 2500.00 adj costs 50.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Wheels Financial Group, Llc. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Fictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Wheels Financial Group, Llc. Action Type: Fictitious Business Name Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 34517. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less