This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 09:07:38 (UTC).

Wheels Financial Group, Inc., a California Corporation vs. Dannie L Swaim

Case Summary

On 11/02/2010 Wheels Financial Group, Inc , a California Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dannie L Swaim. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8435

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wheels Financial Group, Inc., A California Corporation

Defendants

Swaim, Dannie L

Pereira, Amy R

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

02/01/2013: Payment Receipt

POS010 Amended Proof of Service of Summons

06/08/2012: POS010 Amended Proof of Service of Summons

Due Diligence Declaration

06/08/2012: Due Diligence Declaration

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

06/08/2012: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

Application for Court Judgment on Declaration in Lieu of Personal Testimony; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

05/29/2012: Application for Court Judgment on Declaration in Lieu of Personal Testimony; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

05/29/2012: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/04/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Notice of Insufficient Filing Fee

11/02/2010: Notice of Insufficient Filing Fee

Notice of Insufficient Filing Fee

11/02/2010: Notice of Insufficient Filing Fee

Notice of Entry of Judgment

01/16/2013: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment

12/24/2012: Judgment

Due Diligence Declaration

06/08/2012: Due Diligence Declaration

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

06/08/2012: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

Due Diligence Declaration

06/08/2012: Due Diligence Declaration

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

01/10/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

01/10/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Payment Receipt

11/17/2010: Payment Receipt

PLD-C-001 Complaint

11/02/2010: PLD-C-001 Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2013
  • Payment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 02/01/2013, transaction number 1118477 and receipt number 297162. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Abstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Wheels Financial Group, Inc., a California Corporation on 01/16/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Holland, Lesley D. to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Complaint associated on 01/07/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Request for Court/Clerk Judgment associated on 01/07/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Summary judgment. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2010
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 11/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Payment Plan payment of 220.00 received for 170 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K on 11/04/2010 from . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Payment received for T18 - Partial payment of Initial Filing or First Paper fee in the amount of 220.00 on 11/04/2010, transaction number 636238 and receipt number 158899. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Statement of Venue filed by Wheels Financial Group, Inc., a California Corporation on 11/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Wheels Financial Group, Inc., a California Corporation on 11/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wheels Financial Group, Inc., a California Corporation on 11/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Complaint filed by Wheels Financial Group, Inc., a California Corporation on 11/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DB is a litigant