This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 06:04:58 (UTC).

Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC vs Raj Transport Inc., a California corp

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Western Truck Parts Equipment Co , LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Raj Transport Inc , a California corp. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4066

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC

Defendant

Raj Transport Inc., a California corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Policar, Raymond A

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Raj Transport Inc., a California corp served on 05/11/2021 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice to Filing Party

05/06/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Raj Transport Inc., a California corp (Defendant); Participant: Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Raj Transport Inc., a California corp served on 05/11/2021 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/02/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co. in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 643303. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Raymond A Policar, retained for Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raj Transport Inc., a California corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Truck Parts & Equipment Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR, RAYMOND A