This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 02:35:16 (UTC).

Western Management Services Inc vs Amber Coleman

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Western Management Services Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Amber Coleman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5615

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western Management Services Inc

Defendant

Coleman, Amber

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mootz, James P

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Amber Coleman served on 12/18/2018 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 12/18/2018. $60.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Western Management Services Inc against Amber Coleman filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Amber Coleman served on 01/24/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2019

Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019
View Court Documents

Writ of Possession as to Amber Coleman served on 01/24/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

Writ of Possession issued as to Amber Coleman on 01/10/2019 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

Payment received by James Mootz in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 375873. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019
View Court Documents

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Western Management Services Inc against Amber Coleman filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2019
View Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2019
View Court Documents

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 12/18/2018. $60.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2019
View Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons as to Amber Coleman served on 12/18/2018 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2019

Request for Default against Amber Coleman, All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Management Services Inc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018

Payment received by James Mootz in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 368234. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018

Attorney, James P Mootz, retained for Western Management Services Inc . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018

Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less