This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 17:12:55 (UTC).

West Yosemite Properties, LLC vs. Michael Newhard

Case Summary

On 06/09/2015 West Yosemite Properties, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Michael Newhard. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5223

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Yosemite Properties, Llc

Defendant

Newhard, Michael

Assignee

Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

Struck, James D.

 

Court Documents

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Assignment of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for West Yosemite Properties, Llc against Michael Newhard in the amount of $10,758.00 Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Not Entered . See attached filing. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Invalid, see attached filing Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Payment Receipt

07/06/2015: Payment Receipt

Notice to Filing Party

06/26/2015: Notice to Filing Party

Notice that you have been sued

06/09/2015: Notice that you have been sued

Notice that you have been sued

06/09/2015: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

06/09/2015: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2016
  • Attorney, James D. Struck, retained for Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for West Yosemite Properties, Llc against Michael Newhard in the amount of $10,758.00 Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Invalid, see attached filing Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by West Yosemite Properties, Llc. Not Entered . See attached filing. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Complaint associated on 07/21/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2015
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Address for James Mootz selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Status of West Yosemite Properties, LLC updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Notice that you have been sued generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Original Summons filed by West Yosemite Properties, LLC on 06/09/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by West Yosemite Properties, LLC on 06/09/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Complaint filed by West Yosemite Properties, LLC on 06/09/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Struck, James D.