This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 03:16:46 (UTC).

Wendy Danielle Brown vs Javan Ware

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Wendy Danielle Brown filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Javan Ware. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fattarsi, Jonathan W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1533

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brown, Wendy Danielle

Respondent

Ware, Javan

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, Wendy Danielle. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Brown, Wendy Danielle. Action Type: Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CH110 MP Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/22/2021. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Wendy Danielle Brown. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CH200 MP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Javan Ware served on 02/24/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 03/19/2021 10:30 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

CH130 MP Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 03/19/2021. See Order filed herein. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

 

Docket Entries

03/19/2021

HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Jonathan W. Fattarsi

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 03/19/2021. See Order filed herein. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 03/19/2021 10:30 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on March 19, 2021. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Javan Ware served on 02/24/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 03/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Fattarsi in Department M2. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Wendy Danielle Brown. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/22/2021. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Brown, Wendy Danielle. Action Type: Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, Wendy Danielle. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less