This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/08/2023 at 19:06:55 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Sarha D Vannostrand

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sarha D Vannostrand. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0522

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Vannostrand, Sarha D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brooks, David

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sarha D Vannostrand served on 02/05/2023 by Personal Service. $75.00.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Sarha D Vannostrand Entered

CIV-100 Request for Entry of Default and Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

Declaration

Affidavit of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Re: Non-Military Status filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

Declaration

Declaration of Ashley Mulhorn: Attorney Fees and Mailing Demand Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Re: Non-Military Status filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Ashley Mulhorn: Attorney Fees and Mailing Demand Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Sarha D Vannostrand Entered; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Sarha D Vannostrand served on 02/05/2023 by Personal Service. $75.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by N.A. Wells Fargo Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 805787.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, David Brooks, retained for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less