This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/14/2020 at 02:53:43 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Phil Schmit

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Phil Schmit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2273

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Schmit, Phil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marquez, Mark

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Phil Schmit in the amount of 13743.07. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Phil Schmit Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration RE: Affidavit of Military Status

Declaration RE: Affidavit of Military Status filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Case Summary

Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Attorney fee Declaration CCP 585(a)

Attorney fee Declaration CCP 585(a) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Phil Schmit served on 09/24/2019 by Substituted Service. $99.50. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Phil Schmit in the amount of 13743.07. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney fee Declaration CCP 585(a) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Summary in Support of Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration RE: Affidavit of Military Status filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Phil Schmit Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Phil Schmit served on 09/24/2019 by Substituted Service. $99.50. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by N.A. Wells Fargo Bank in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 474128. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Mark Marquez, retained for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.