This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 01:33:55 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Nicholas J Hall

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nicholas J Hall. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2271

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Hall, Nicholas J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marquez, Mark

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Nicholas J Hall served on 09/27/2019 by Personal Service. $99.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Attorney Fee Declaration CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration Re: Affidavit of Military Status

Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of service of Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Nicholas J Hall in the amount of $10,529.78. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Case Summary

Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Default against Nicholas J Hall Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Nicholas J Hall in the amount of $10,529.78. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Nicholas J Hall Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Default Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Proof of service of Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Nicholas J Hall served on 09/27/2019 by Personal Service. $99.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Attorney, Mark Marquez, retained for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received by N.A. Wells Fargo Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 474118. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.