This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 07:25:56 (UTC).

Wayne Kool vs. Pulte Home Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/09/2014 Wayne Kool filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5671

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wayne Kool

Atiffi, Musa

Belshaw, Daniel

Bhabuthmal Family Trust

Bhabuthmal, Kanti

Bimemiller, Kim

Bimemiller, Laila

Blutman, Ramona

Blutman, Steve

Cai, Shusheng

Cai, Xiaolu

Cao, Thong

Chahal Singh Kalonia Family Trust

Cheng, Yujie

Chu, jie

Chulliyil, John

Chulliyil, Usha

David, Tammy

Fregoso, Roberta

Fung, Sammy

209 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chodzko, Megan Maxine

Other Attorneys

Chodzko, Megan

Schmitt, Edward Walter

Moak, Stacy M.

Aguilera, Eric A.

Schneider, William P

Letofsky, Larry D. ESQ.

Blake, Albert P.

Shapiro, Megan A.

Fischer, Todd Allen

Smith, Daniel H.

Cote, Scott Dennis

Kidd, G. Noel

Hammons, Wallace William

Arneal, Richard George

McCaffrey, Timothy J.

O'Brien, Lauren

Parker, James C

Kubein, Ramsey

Wasinda, John J

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Halabi, Inc dba Duracite. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Ruiz Brothers Preferred Plumbing, INC.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of Pulte Home Corp. First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Ruiz Brothers Preferred Plumbing, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order Setting Aside Default of Sharcar Enterprises, Inc. DBA Custom Marble & Onyx filed by Sharcar Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Daridon, Inc. Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

Affidavit

Affidavit of Due Diligence on Kiwi Stairs, Inc. filed by Kool, Wayne. Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Case Management Statement filed by Kool, Wayne, et al. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Sherman-Loehr Custom Tile Works, Inc. e/s/a Sherman Loehr custom Tile Works, Inc.'s Answer to Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint filed by Sherman Loehr Custom Tile Works, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (amount over $25,000) filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM110 Summons - Civil Cross Complaint

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amended Notice

Amended Notice of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Selectbuild. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Peninsula Floors, Inc. Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Summit Plastering, INC.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of Pulte Home Corp. First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Summit Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Affidavit

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service on Norman Masonry, Inc. filed by Kool, Wayne. Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Affidavit

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service on Daridon, Inc. filed by Kool, Wayne. Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Affidavit

Affidavit of Due Diligence on Candy's Landscape, Inc. filed by Kool, Wayne. Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Cross-Defendant House Construction's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Pulte Home Corporation filed by House Construction, Inc.. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Payment Receipt

03/17/2015: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Reassignment

01/30/2015: Notice of Case Reassignment

492 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Pulte Home Corporation, a California Corporation, American Engineering Contractors, Inc., Bmd Plumbing, Inc., Coastal Construction & Lumber Company, Colorific Painting, Dellinger Concrete, Jerry Dellinger Concrete, Inc., J. Edward Gish, Inc., Sharcar Enterprises, Inc., Vaca Valley Roofing, Inc., CVC Construction Corp., CVC Construction Corp. Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling filed by Pulte Home Corporation, a California Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Ruling; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 05/23/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/22/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on May 23, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pulte's Status Conference Statement filed by Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: Status Report; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling Re February 8, 2019 Case Management Conference filed by Pulte Home Corporation, a California Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Ruling; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 02/08/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
1,091 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2014
  • Payment received for 194 - Complaint or other 1st paper, 34 - Complex case fee plaintiff in the amount of 1,435.00 on 06/09/2014, transaction number 1352314 and receipt number 358250. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Address for Megan Chodzko selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Cause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 11/06/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 42 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer McNatt, Bob. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Original Summons filed by Kool, Wayne on 06/09/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kool, Wayne on 06/09/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Complaint filed by Kool, Wayne on 06/09/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGUILERA ERIC A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, G NOEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, WILLIAM P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAKE, ALBERT P