This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/17/2020 at 15:26:35 (UTC).

Wagio Collins vs Stockton Covenant Church, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Wagio Collins filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Stockton Covenant Church, Inc . This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0211

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Collins, Wagio

Defendants

Stockton Covenant Church, Inc.,

Marston, Keith Douglas

Guardian Ad Litem

Waigi, Isabelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zabetian, Arash H.

Defendant Attorneys

Griffith, Amanda N

Bernhardt, Victoria R

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

06/26/2020: Proposed Order

Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application to Remove Guardian Ad Litem filed by Collins, Wagio. Action Type: Ex Parte Application; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Order After Hearing

Order on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Remove Guardian Ad Litem Denied by Judge Abdallah filed by Wagio Collins. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Marston, Keith Douglas. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 07/02/2020 09:15 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stockton Covenant Church, Inc., served on 01/30/2020 by Personal Service. $125.72. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer filed by Stockton Covenant Church, Inc.,. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Marston, Keith Douglas. Action Type: Association of Counsel; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Isabelle Waigi (Guardian Ad Litem); Participant: Keith Douglas Marston (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Covenant Church, Inc., (Defendant); Participant: Wagio Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Vacated; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Isabelle Waigi (Guardian Ad Litem); Participant: Keith Douglas Marston (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Covenant Church, Inc., (Defendant); Participant: Wagio Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Reassigned; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: Keith Douglas Marston (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Covenant Church, Inc., (Defendant); Participant: Wagio Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Remove Guardian Ad Litem Denied by Judge Abdallah filed by Wagio Collins. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Ex Parte; Court Room: 10A; Result: Held; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Isabelle Waigi (Guardian Ad Litem); Participant: Keith Douglas Marston (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Covenant Church, Inc., (Defendant); Participant: Wagio Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 01/08/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 07/02/2020 09:15 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Ex Parte held on July 2, 2020. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Wagio Collins in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 568967. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Wagio Collins filed Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Wagio Collins in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 520121. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Arash H. Zabetian, retained for Wagio Collins . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/07/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Collins, Wagio. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Collins, Wagio. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Wagio Collins in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 519848. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZABETIAN ARASH H.