This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 05:08:49 (UTC).

Vivint Solar Developer, LLC vs Paula Harreld

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Vivint Solar Developer, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Paula Harreld. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4754

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivint Solar Developer, LLC

Defendant

Harreld, Paula

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Locke, Wendy A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Paula Harreld served on 06/29/2022 by Personal Service. $95.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Paula Harreld served on 06/29/2022 by Personal Service. $95.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/06/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Vivint Solar Developer in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 746201.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Wendy A. Locke, Herum Crabtree Suntag retained for Vivint Solar Developer, LLC .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Locke, Wendy A