This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/25/2018 at 19:37:07 (UTC).

Victoriano Euseda vs. George Perry & Sons, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2013 Victoriano Euseda filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against George Perry Sons, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3740

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Victoriano Euseda

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Euseda, Victoriano

Miscellaneous Participant,

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

George Perry & Sons, Inc

George Perry & Sons, Inc.

Ferguson Farms, Inc.

Ferguson, Robert K

Cross Defendant

Mendoza, Abel

Intervenor

Star Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sariol, Frank R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Kronlund, Michael C

Cross Defendant Attorney

Hansard, Wade Michael

Intervenor Attorney

Bush, Bryan Ronald

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

06/19/2014: Minute Order

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

04/09/2013: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Summons returned Unserved as to George Perry & Sons, Inc.. Costs $104.85 First Amended Complaint; Declaration of Mailing has no date of mailing.#5b incomplete on POS010 Judge: Holly, Carter.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Star Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Association

Association of Counsel filed by Euseda, Victoriano. Action Type: Association of Counsel; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration of Michael C. Kronlund

Declaration of Michael C. Kronlund filed by George Perry & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Payment Receipt

07/15/2013: Payment Receipt

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by George Perry & Sons, Inc.. **As to Cross-Complaint** Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Abel Mendoza, George Perry & Sons, Inc. Entered. As to Cross-Complaint Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/23/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 23, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/16/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Filing as to Victoriano Euseda, George Perry & Sons, Inc., Ferguson Farms, Inc., Robert K Ferguson Entered. COMPLAINT ONLY Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to COMPLAINT ONLY filed by Euseda, Victoriano. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Star Insurance Company. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2013
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 09/06/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Original Summons filed by Euseda, Victoriano on 04/09/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Euseda, Victoriano on 04/09/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Complaint filed by Euseda, Victoriano on 04/09/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAR INSURANCE COMPANY, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARIOL, FRANK R