This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 11:23:11 (UTC).

VFT Properties LLC vs. Monica Curioca

Case Summary

On 02/25/2015 VFT Properties LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Monica Curioca. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1651

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vft Properties Llc

Defendants

Curioca, Elias

Curioca, Monica

Assignee

Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

Struck, James D.

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Execution as to Monica Curioca, Elisa Curioca returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice

Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice Received by Curioca, Monica; Curioca, Elias. Action Type: Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice

Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice Received by Curioca, Monica; Curioca, Elias. Action Type: Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $155.00 Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Vft Properties Llc. with proof of service. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Bankruptcy notice

09/08/2016: Bankruptcy notice

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $221.38 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Assignment of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment filed by Vft Properties Llc. Action Type: Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Vft Properties Llc. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Minute Order

04/15/2015: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

04/07/2015: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

03/27/2015: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice that you have been sued

02/25/2015: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

02/25/2015: Payment Receipt

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution as to Monica Curioca, Elisa Curioca returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice Received by Curioca, Monica; Curioca, Elias. Action Type: Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice Received by Curioca, Monica; Curioca, Elias. Action Type: Miscellaneous Bankruptcy Notice; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $155.00 Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Vft Properties Llc. with proof of service. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Payment received by Consumer Affiliated in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 60881. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $221.38 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Attorney, James D. Struck, retained for Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Vft Properties Llc. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by Vft Properties Llc. Action Type: Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Attorney James D Struck, retained for VFT Properties LLC . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2015
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 02/25/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 02/25/2015, transaction number 1468947 and receipt number 388961. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Address for Anthony Rowe selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Original Summons filed by VFT Properties LLC on 02/25/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by VFT Properties LLC on 02/25/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Complaint filed by VFT Properties LLC on 02/25/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Struck, James D.