This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 11:18:37 (UTC).

V.F.T. Properties, LLC vs Erma Claros et al.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2016 V F T Properties, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Erma Claros. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eagle, Kristine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4171

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eagle, Kristine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

V.F.T. Properties, LLC

Defendants

Claros, Erma

Thompson, Dewayne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dewayne Thompson served on 05/03/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Total judgment amount $3,165.20. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Service date 05/04/2016, fees $0.00. Complies with ccp 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for V.F.T. Properties, LLC against Erma Claros, Dewayne Thompson filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. NOT entered as to all occupants. Filed prematurely. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Erma Claros served on 05/03/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2017
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Total judgment amount $3,165.20. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Filing Party. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2016
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Possession as to Erma Claros served on 06/30/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Dewayne Thompson on 06/06/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Erma Claros on 06/06/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2016
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2016

DocketPayment received by Guarantee Eviction Services in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 67648. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
05/11/2016
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. NOT Entered as to all occupants. Filed prematurely. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2016
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Erma Claros served on 05/03/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2016
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dewayne Thompson served on 05/03/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016

DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 55638. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by V.F.T. Properties, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016

DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for V.F.T. Properties, LLC . Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2016

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less