This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/25/2018 at 11:33:28 (UTC).

Vernon Hoag vs. Daniel Amiel Hoag

Case Summary

On 03/05/2013 Vernon Hoag filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Daniel Amiel Hoag. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2240

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miscellaneous Participant 101

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Miscellaneous Participant,

Defendant and Plaintiff

Miscellaneous Participant,

Cross Defendant

Lisa Berg, Successor Trustee Of The Beverly J. Hoag Living Trust

Interested Party

Hoag, Shirley Olsen

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

10/09/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

03/05/2013: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

03/05/2013: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action Cross-Complaint as to Daniel Hoag, Lisa Berg, Vernon Hoag Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Payment Receipt

06/29/2015: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

07/22/2015: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

09/15/2014: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

05/21/2015: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

06/02/2015: Minute Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $230.50, receipt number 238446. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Hoag, Vernon. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $280.00, receipt number 6290. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketCase status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action Cross-Complaint as to Daniel Hoag, Lisa Berg, Vernon Hoag Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action Complaint as to Vernon Hoag, Daniel Amiel Hoag, Lisa Berg Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Hoag, Vernon. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
302 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketCause of Action number 6 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketCause of Action number 5 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (39-2011-00266914-PR-TR-STK; 39-2012-00282129-PR-LS-STK) filed by Hoag, Vernon on 03/05/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Vernon Hoag) filed by Hoag, Vernon on 03/05/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 08/06/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hoag, Vernon on 03/05/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hoag, Vernon on 03/05/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hoag, Vernon on 03/05/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less