This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 02:05:30 (UTC).

Vanzetti Properties LP vs Martin A Turley III

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 Vanzetti Properties LP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Martin A Turley III. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barrera, Gus. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************8898

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barrera, Gus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vanzetti Properties LP

Defendant

Turley III, Martin A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Welch, John W

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Martin A Turley III served on 09/01/2017 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons as to All Occupants served on 09/01/2017 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Martin A Turley III Entered Judge: Barrera, Gus.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Vanzetti Properties LP against Martin A Turley III filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Martin A Turley III served on 10/12/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Total judgment amount $4,823.55. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Total judgment amount $4,823.55. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Notice that you have been sued sent to Martin A Turley III returned with forwarding address provided by USPS. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Martin A Turley III served on 10/12/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Martin A Turley III on 09/20/2017 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Vanzetti Properties LP against Martin A Turley III filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Martin A Turley III Entered Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • Payment received by Lisa Rotert in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 204778. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Attorney, John W Welch, retained for Vanzetti Properties LP . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Payment received by Lisa Rotert in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 203029. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Vanzetti Properties LP. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welch, John W