This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 16:25:21 (UTC).

Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc. vs Stadco, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stadco, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3040

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.

Defendants

Sylvester, Jeff

Stadco, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weber, Matthew J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeff Sylvester served on 04/06/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stadco, Inc. served on 04/06/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Stadco, Inc., Jeff Sylvester Entered Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Court Default Judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Request to set default or uncontested matter for hearing

Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Brief Summary of Case in Support of Request for Default Judgment

Brief Summary of Case in Support of Request for Default Judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration of Ronald Van de Pol in support of request for default judgment

Declaration of Ronald Van de Pol in support of request for default judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration of Michael C. Minahan in support of request for default judgment

Declaration of Michael C. Minahan in support of request for default judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice to Filing Party

06/22/2017: Notice to Filing Party

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc., Stadco, Inc., Jeff Sylvester Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc., Stadco, Inc., Jeff Sylvester Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Michael C. Minahan in support of request for default judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Ronald Van de Pol in support of request for default judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Brief Summary of Case in Support of Request for Default Judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Default Prove-up Hearing , set for 06/26/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeff Sylvester served on 04/06/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Stadco, Inc. served on 04/06/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/26/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Attorney, Matthew J Weber, retained for Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc. . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Payment received by Inc. Van De Pol Enterprises in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 154693. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Van De Pol Enterprises, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Van De Pol Enterprises Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where STADCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBER, MATTHEW J