This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 11:49:27 (UTC).

Van Daniel Vuren vs Todd Garibaldi et al.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 Van Daniel Vuren filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Todd Garibaldi. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4520

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vuren, Van Daniel

Vuren, Daniel Van

Defendants

Garibaldi, Todd

Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,

Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,

Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,

Not Classified By Court

Morris, James M.

Other

Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sodhi, Jakrun S.

Defendant Attorney

Riddle, Patrick D

Other Attorney

Gerschler, Anton C

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Separate Statement

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Patrick D. Riddle in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Debbie Hill in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Request for Judicial Notice

Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to File First Amended Complaint signed by Judge Sueyres entered and filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash held on 07/18/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Defendants' Reply to opposition to motion to quash deposition subpoena for production of business records served by Plaintiff

Defendants' Reply to opposition to motion to quash deposition subpoena for production of business records served by Plaintiff` filed by Garibaldi, Todd; Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Todd Garibaldi in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order

Stipulation for Order Continuing Settlement Conference and Trial Date signed by Judge Humphreys filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., Todd Garibaldi. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Opposition

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records Served by Plaintiff; Request for sanctions Against Defendants and Deponent filed by Vuren, Daniel Van. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

subpoena for production of business records

Declaration of Patrick D. Riddle in Support of Defendants' motion to quash deposition subpoena for production of business records served by Plaintiff filed by Garibaldi, Todd; Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Garibaldi, Todd; Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

ANSWER First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Garibaldi, Todd AND Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency Inc. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

cm010

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vuren, Van Daniel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of service filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Debbie Hill in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Patrick D. Riddle in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Todd Garibaldi in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants, Todd Garibaldi and Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc., a California Corporation,; Todd Garibaldi, individually, and dba Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc.,. Action Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Payment received by Inc., Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency in the amount of $500.00. Receipt number 295927. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adj. Deft's MSJ/MSA, set for 08/09/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service filed by Vuren, Van Daniel. as to Todd Garibaldi Insurance Agency, Inc. Served on 5-23-16.(dba on Complaint, not individual Defendant) Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Todd Garibaldi served on 05/23/2016 by Substituted Service. $80.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/09/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Payment received by Van Vuren in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 59030. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vuren, Van Daniel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vuren, Van Daniel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Attorney, Jakrun S. Sodhi, retained for Van Daniel Vuren . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less