This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 03:02:29 (UTC).

U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee vs Laura A Rodriguez et al.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 U S ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U S Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Laura A Rodriguez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1410

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee

Defendants

Rodriguez, Francisco

Rodriguez, Francisco Javier

Rodriguez, Laura A

Garcia, Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Merritt, Tyneia G.

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. INVALID, No mailing attached, no posting indicated. Does not comply with ccp 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Francisco Rodriguez served on 12/14/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $57.00. With attached Declaration of Diligence and Mailing. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Laura A Rodriguez,Francisco Javier Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Antonio Garcia Returned Satisfied with Costs $145.00 Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee against Laura A Rodriguez, Francisco Javier Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Antonio Garcia filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Entered as to all occupants. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Service date 12/11/15, fees $51.00. With attached Declaration of Mailing. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. NOT entered as proof of service is invalid. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Laura A Rodriguez,Francisco Javier Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Antonio Garcia Returned Satisfied with Costs $145.00 Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Francisco Rodriguez (). Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Antonio Garcia on 02/01/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Francisco Rodriguez on 02/01/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Francisco Javier Rodriguez on 02/01/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Laura A Rodriguez on 02/01/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 27656. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee against Laura A Rodriguez, Francisco Javier Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Antonio Garcia filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketRequest for Default against Laura A Rodriguez Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Laura A Rodriguez served on 12/10/2015. Type of Service Personal. $65.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 13260. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketAttorney, Tyneia G. Merritt, retained for U.S. ROF III Legal Title Trust 2015-1, By U.S. Bank National Association, As Legal Title Trustee . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Rof II Legal Title Trust 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERRITT TYNEIA GENE