This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 18:08:49 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association vs Travis McManus aka Travis M McManus

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Travis McManus aka Travis M McManus. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0712

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendant

Travis McManus aka Travis M McManus

Manteca, CA 95337-8568

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Douglas S.

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by U.S. Bank National Association.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by U.S. Bank National Association.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 395(b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed by U.S. Bank National Association.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Travis McManus aka Travis M McManus served on 12/08/2022 by Substituted Service. $68.50.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Travis McManus aka Travis M McManus served on 12/08/2022 by Substituted Service. $68.50.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP 395(b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed by U.S. Bank National Association.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by U.S. Bank National Association.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by U.S. Bank National Association.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received by U.S. Bank National Association in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 789922.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Douglas S. Wallace, retained for U.S. Bank National Association .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACE, DOUGLAS STUART