This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:23:49 (UTC).

Ursula Siebertz vs Brian Lynch

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Ursula Siebertz filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Brian Lynch. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4550

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Siebertz, Ursula

Respondent

Lynch, Brian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Court Room: 4A; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Brian Lynch (Respondent); Participant: Ursula Siebertz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Court Room: 4A; Result: Held; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Brian Lynch (Respondent); Participant: Ursula Siebertz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Ursula Siebertz. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Ursula Siebertz) *No Pos*, set for 12/21/2021 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 11/03/2021 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on November 3, 2021. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Ursula Siebertz) *No Pos*, set for 11/03/2021 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Ursula Siebertz. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 10/13/2021. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Ex Parte Application. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children filed by Siebertz, Ursula. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less