This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:08 (UTC).

United Property Investment, LLC vs Catherine Wilxoxen

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 United Property Investment, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Catherine Wilxoxen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1834

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Property Investment, LLC

Defendant

Wilcoxen, Catherine

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Catherine Wilcoxen Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

03/25/2016: Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Notice to Filing Party

03/23/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by United Property Investment, LLC. INVALID, ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH AMENDED COMPLAINT Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for United Property Investment, LLC against Catherine Wilcoxen filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Amended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Catherine Wilcoxen served on 03/07/2016. Type of Service Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as to Catherine Wilcoxen filed by United Property Investment, LLC. FORM INCOMPLETE Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Catherine Wilcoxen Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for United Property Investment, LLC against Catherine Wilcoxen filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Catherine Wilcoxen Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by United Property Investment, LLC. INVALID, ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH AMENDED COMPLAINT Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Catherine Wilcoxen served on 03/07/2016. Type of Service Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Catherine Wilcoxen Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as to Catherine Wilcoxen filed by United Property Investment, LLC. FORM INCOMPLETE Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication submitted by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 37087. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United Property Investment, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 33925. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less