Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:00:47 (UTC).

United Financial Casualty Company vs Amanda Macnamara et al.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2016 United Financial Casualty Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Amanda Macnamara. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2747

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Financial Casualty Company

Defendants

Macnamara, Desmond

Macnamara, Amanda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nivinskus, Mark Robert

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to United Financial Casualty Company, Amanda Macnamara, Desmond Macnamara Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 10/20/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request to Enter Default held on 08/18/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/19/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Amanda Macnamara served on 01/04/2017 by Substituted Service. $79.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Desmond Macnamara served on 01/03/2017 by Personal Service. $79.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Statement of Damages

Statement - (Other) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to United Financial Casualty Company, Amanda Macnamara, Desmond Macnamara Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 10/20/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request to Enter Default held on August 18, 2017. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request to Enter Default held on 08/18/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/19/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request to Enter Default , set for 08/18/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on June 19, 2017. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Desmond Macnamara served on 01/03/2017 by Personal Service. $79.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/19/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Attorney, Mark Robert Nivinskus, retained for United Financial Casualty Company . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement - (Other) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Payment received by United Financial Casualty Company in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 127726. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT