This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 05:21:44 (UTC).

Unifund CCR Partners vs. Catalina A Montes

Case Summary

On 04/22/2009 Unifund CCR Partners filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Catalina A Montes. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7245

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund Ccr Partners

Defendant

Montes, Catalina A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

03/08/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

02/08/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

01/06/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

01/06/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

12/28/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/12/2009: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/11/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/11/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

04/24/2009: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

04/24/2009: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Dismissed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Complaint dismissed with disposition of Dismissed Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Status of Unifund CCR Partners updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Complaint dismissed with disposition of Dismissed Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Status of Catalina Montes updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2009
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 04/24/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Payment received for 30 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 200.00 on 04/24/2009, transaction number 311444 and receipt number 60632. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Address for Steven Booska selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Contact information updated for Booska,Steven . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Contact information updated for Booska,Steven . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Case assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Unifund CCR Partners on 04/22/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Complaint filed by Unifund CCR Partners on 04/22/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less