This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 08:47:22 (UTC).

U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation et al. vs Martin Hezron Barroga et al.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 U-Haul Co of California, a California corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Martin Hezron Barroga. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8873

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation

U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation

U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation

Defendants

Barroga, Martin Hezron

Galvan, Rafael

Hernandez, Chalina

Olivas, Steve

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Parker, Michael R

 

Court Documents

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/21/2022 08:30 AM .

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Rafael Galvan.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Chalina Hernandez.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as tp Chalina Hernandez ONLY filed by Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with prejudice as Rafael Galvan ONLY to filed by Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Rafael Galvan Not Entered

CIV 100 Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Chalina Hernandez Not Entered

CIV 100 Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation; U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation; Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Plaintiff); Chalina Hernandez (Defendant); Martin Hezron Barroga (Defendant); Rafael Galvan (Defendant); Steve Olivas (Defendant); U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Plaintiff); Chalina Hernandez (Defendant); Martin Hezron Barroga (Defendant); Rafael Galvan (Defendant); Steve Olivas (Defendant); U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication , set for 06/21/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/21/2022 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 21, 2022.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Rafael Galvan.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Chalina Hernandez.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice as Rafael Galvan ONLY to filed by Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation.; Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice as tp Chalina Hernandez ONLY filed by Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation.; Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation.; Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Chalina Hernandez served on 10/23/2021 by Personal Service. $72.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/21/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation; Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation; U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received by a U-Haul Co. of California in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 681262.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael R Parker, retained for Arcoa Risk Retention Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael R Parker, retained for U-Haul Co. of Arizona, an Arizona corporation .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael R Parker, retained for U-Haul Co. of California, a California corporation .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER MICHAEL R.