This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:47:07 (UTC).

Troy Daniels et al. vs Allen Sells et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Troy Daniels filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Allen Sells. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1909

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniels, Troy

Daniels Propertties, Inc

Removed,

Defendants

A&S Mobile Auto

Sells, Allen

Removed

 

Court Documents

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. INVALID PROOF, NO SIGNATURE Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

07/06/2016: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as TO ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Allen Sells served on 06/22/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. NOT ENTERED AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

03/01/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc; Daniels, Troy. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Daniels Propertties, Inc against Allen Sells filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniels Properties, Inc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Allen Sells served on 07/11/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Allen Sells Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Amended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Allen Sells served on 07/11/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Allen Sells on 07/11/2016 to San Francisco County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Payment received by Propertties, Daniels in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 78311. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Daniels Propertties, Inc against Allen Sells filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as TO ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. NOT ENTERED AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2016
  • Payment received by Propertties, Daniels in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 72570. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniels Properties, Inc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc; Daniels, Troy. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniels Propertties, Inc; Daniels, Troy. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 34608. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less