Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2018 at 07:41:57 (UTC).

Transworld Systems Inc vs. Skelton

Case Summary

On 01/21/2010 Transworld Systems Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Skelton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0950

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Transworld Systems Inc

Defendants

Skelton, Brandy

Miscellaneous Participant,

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

08/02/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice to Filing Party

06/29/2010: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

06/29/2010: Notice to Filing Party

Minute Order

06/07/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

05/03/2010: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

04/05/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Voided Filing

03/05/2010: Notice of Voided Filing

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

01/22/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

01/22/2010: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Kronlund, Barbara to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Status of Transworld Systems Inc updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Status of Brandy Skelton updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Status of Transworld Systems Inc updated to Active/Self-Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Status of Brandy Skelton updated to Named. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Filing reopened. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Declaration - Other (without prejudice and entering dismissal with prejudice signed by Judge Kronlund.) associated on 11/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2010
  • , Credit Management Services selected to be used on case. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Transworld Systems Inc on 01/21/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Transworld Systems Inc on 01/21/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Complaint filed by Transworld Systems Inc on 01/21/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSWORLD SYSTEM INC. is a litigant