This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 21:23:15 (UTC).

Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited vs Jamon D Lomack

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jamon D Lomack. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barrera, Gus. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6034

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barrera, Gus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited

Defendant

Lomack, Jamon D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Echols, Paul E

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Jamon D Lomack served on 07/19/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $0.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Jamon D Lomack Entered Judge: Barrera, Gus.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited against Jamon D Lomack filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jamon D Lomack bysubstituted served on 06/15/2017 by $40.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of service as to All Occupants served by substituted service on 06/15/2016 does complies with CCP 415.46 with costs $40.00 filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Jamon D Lomack served on 07/19/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $0.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited against Jamon D Lomack filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Payment received by G.O.N.E., INC. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 186700. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Jamon D Lomack Entered Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to All Occupants served by substituted service on 06/15/2016 does complies with CCP 415.46 with costs $40.00 filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jamon D Lomack bysubstituted served on 06/15/2017 by $40.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Attorney, Paul E Echols, retained for Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tracy Chesapeake Bay Limited. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Payment received by GONE Inc. in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 178846. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less