This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 05:18:49 (UTC).

Touan Buphaphan vs Min Huh et al.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Touan Buphaphan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Min Huh. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6621

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buphaphan, Touan

Defendants

Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church

Buphaphan, Somphone

Huh, Min

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chan, Clarence K

Defendant Attorney

Lee, Christie S

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/08/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Huh, Min; Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Min Huh. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer filed by Huh, Min. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service as to answer filed by Huh, Min. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration of Diligence

Declaration of Diligence of Lisa Nesgis filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Min Huh served on 09/03/2020 by Personal Service. $150.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church served on 08/13/2020 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Min Huh (Defendant); Participant: Somphone Buphaphan (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church (Defendant); Participant: Touan Buphaphan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Held; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Min Huh (Defendant); Participant: Somphone Buphaphan (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church (Defendant); Participant: Touan Buphaphan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/09/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on February 8, 2021. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/08/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Huh, Min; Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Min Huh. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Huh, Min. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service as to answer filed by Huh, Min. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Min Huh served on 09/03/2020 by Personal Service. $150.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Stockton Bansuk Presbyterian Church served on 08/13/2020 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/08/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Buphaphan, Touan. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Touan Buphaphan in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 578312. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Clarence K Chan, retained for Touan Buphaphan . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chan, Clarence K