Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 14:37:03 (UTC).

Tonya Melton vs Amber Talamants

Case Summary

On 02/27/2017 Tonya Melton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Amber Talamants. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1887

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melton, Tonya

Defendant

Talamants, Amber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Niermeyer, Lawrence T

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Talamants, Amber. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Tonya Melton, Amber Talamants Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/11/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Amber Talamants Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/16/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/16/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/28/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Amber Talamants served on 08/14/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

02/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

02/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Talamants, Amber. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Tonya Melton, Amber Talamants Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Talamants, Amber. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 07/11/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on April 11, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/11/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Amber Talamants Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Amber Talamants served on 08/14/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/28/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Payment received by Tonya Melton in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 146025. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Attorney, Lawrence T Niermeyer, retained for Tonya Melton . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Melton, Tonya. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIERMEYER LAWRENCE