This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/31/2021 at 02:00:58 (UTC).

Tina Rocha vs Adventist Health Lodi Memorial et al.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Tina Rocha filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Adventist Health Lodi Memorial. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1747

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rocha, Tina

Defendants

Raymond Dewri M.D.

Adventist Health System/West

Adventist Health Lodi Memorial

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rocha, Tina. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rocha, Tina. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/26/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/04/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Adventist Health Lodi Memorial (Defendant); Participant: Adventist Health System/West (Defendant); Participant: Raymond Dewri M.D. (Defendant); Participant: Tina Rocha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Held; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Adventist Health Lodi Memorial (Defendant); Participant: Adventist Health System/West (Defendant); Participant: Raymond Dewri M.D. (Defendant); Participant: Tina Rocha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/04/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 26, 2021. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/26/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/26/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rocha, Tina. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rocha, Tina. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Tina Rocha in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 625248. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant