This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 03:18:17 (UTC).

Thomas Purdom et al. vs Gary Carson et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Thomas Purdom filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gary Carson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2276

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Purdom, Suzanne

Purdom, Thomas

Defendants

Carson, Gary

Maher, Guinnaavere

 

Court Documents

Decision

Decision Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 02/11/2020 09:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo held on 02/10/2020 09:30 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Trial De Novo cost of appeal 75.00, set for 02/10/2020 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

SC140 Notice of Appeal (Small Claims)

Notice of Appeal filed by Carson, Gary; Maher, Guinnaavere. Action Type: Notice of Appeal (Small Claims); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/05/2019 01:30 PM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Gary Carson served on 09/23/2019 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Guinnaavere Maher served on 09/23/2019 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Purdom, Thomas; Purdom, Suzanne. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecision Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 02/11/2020 09:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial De Novo; Court Room: 6D; Result: Held; Judge: Richard M. Mallett; Participant: Gary Carson (Defendant); Participant: Guinnaavere Maher (Defendant); Participant: Suzanne Purdom (Plaintiff); Participant: Thomas Purdom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Trial De Novo held on February 10, 2020. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial De Novo held on 02/10/2020 09:30 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial De Novo cost of appeal 75.00, set for 02/10/2020 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Appeal. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal filed by Carson, Gary; Maher, Guinnaavere. Action Type: Notice of Appeal (Small Claims); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on December 5, 2019. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/05/2019 01:30 PM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Gary Carson served on 09/23/2019 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Guinnaavere Maher served on 09/23/2019 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $2,998.00 Costs $50.00, set for 12/05/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 3B. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Purdom, Thomas; Purdom, Suzanne. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Thomas Purdom in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 474176. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.