This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 10:05:07 (UTC).

Thomas Jackson vs. Jon Fountain

Case Summary

On 11/22/2011 Thomas Jackson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jon Fountain. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5932

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson, Thomas

Defendants

Fountain, Jon

Fountain, Tarra

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt - Void

12/14/2011: Payment Receipt - Void

Void Payment Acknowledgement

12/14/2011: Void Payment Acknowledgement

Returned Check Notice

12/14/2011: Returned Check Notice

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

12/12/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Payment Receipt

12/09/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

12/06/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice that you have been sued

11/22/2011: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

11/22/2011: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • The status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • Writ of Possession Returned filed by Jackson, Thomas on 12/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • Payment for 37A - Request/app/mot/notice to continue hearing or CMC, 173 - Answer or other 1st paper <=$10K, 173 - Answer or other 1st paper <=$10K, transaction number 907268 in the amount of 470.00 voided due to NSF. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • Fountain, Tarra added to NSF list. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • Returned Check Notice generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • Automatic Fee Waiver Denial Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • Automatic Fee Waiver Application Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2011
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 11/22/2011, transaction number 898909 and receipt number 239670. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Address for Thomas Jackson selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Case assigned to Department L1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Jackson, Thomas on 11/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackson, Thomas on 11/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Complaint filed by Jackson, Thomas on 11/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less