This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:07 (UTC).

Thomas Harmon vs Brinker Restaurant Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Thomas Harmon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Brinker Restaurant Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1884

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harmon, Thomas

Harmon, Alicia

Defendants

Brinker Restaurant Corporation

Brinker Restaurant Corporation doing business as Chili's Grill and Bar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goehring, Gregory P

Defendant Attorney

Friend, Molly A

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Answer

Brinker Restaurant Corporation dba Chili's Grill and Bar's Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation doing business as Chili's Grill and Bar. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration of Alicia Harmon in Support of Motion to File Amended Complaint filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Brinker Restaurant Corporation dba Chili's Grill and Bar's Answer to Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion

Plaintiff Thomas Harmon's Notice of Motion and Motion to File Amended Complaint;Declaration of Gregory P. Goehring,Esq.;Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation doing business as Chili's Grill and Bar. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 11/14/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion held on 02/23/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Harmon, Alicia; Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Ross, Roger.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 03/20/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/19/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 08/16/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: McNatt, Bob.

Order Granting Motion to FIle Amended Complaint

Order Granting Motion To File Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Harmon. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 11/14/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment (est 3-5 days), set for 10/22/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 09/17/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on November 14, 2017. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation doing business as Chili's Grill and Bar. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 08/16/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 11/14/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on August 16, 2017. Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation doing business as Chili's Grill and Bar. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Brinker Restaurant Corporation dba Chili's Grill and Bar's Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation doing business as Chili's Grill and Bar. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2016
  • Payment received by Brinker Restaurant Corporation in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 89609. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Brinker Restaurant Corporation dba Chili's Grill and Bar's Answer to Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Brinker Restaurant Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/19/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34344. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harmon, Thomas. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Gregory P Goehring, retained for Thomas Harmon . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less